Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Berger, Jason David (Deactivated: 09 19 2019) filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with CROOM, JANET presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCROOM, JANET Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 17, 2015 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney MICHELANGELO MORTELLARO - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney JASON DAVID BERGER - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DISCHARGE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4120.2765 / 4424563) ( V ) | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4120.2768 / 4424564) ( V ) | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE ( V ) | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | CLOSING ESTATE PROBATE CHECKLIST ( V ) | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY ( V ) | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DISCHARGE ( V ) | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.