Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Santander Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lenzi, Emilio R., against Russo, Girolamo, Russo, Melissa D, Unk Tenant 1, Unk Tenant 2, represented by Engvalson, Kinley I, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with SENIOR JUDGE, JUDGE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSENIOR JUDGE, JUDGE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2015 |
CategoryHomestead Mf $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: May 15, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3901.1502 / 4220197) ( V )
Date: August 15, 2016MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )
Date: September 07, 2016MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: February 19, 2016AMENDED ANSWER
Date: February 08, 2016ORDER ON CMC ( V )
Date: March 07, 2016AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2015ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT ( V )
Date: May 04, 2016RESPONSE
Date: August 13, 2015REPLY ( V ) TO AMENDED AFFIR' DEFENSE
Date: March 03, 2016MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 06, 2015MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: June 18, 2015REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES/ MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: February 02, 2016ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 13, 2016ORDER EXTENDING TIME
Date: August 19, 2015FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V )
Date: August 12, 2016ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL ( V )
Date: November 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney EMILIO R. LENZI - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE UNCLAIMED ADVERTISED NON-RESIDENT COST BOND | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2016000093160 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00 | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE CLERK FEE CA ASSESSED $70.00 | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 REFUND $60.00 RECEIPT #2017000058398 | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3947.1577 / 4262027) ( V ) | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT ( V ) | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V ) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V ) | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.