Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rodrigues, Cynthia Denise, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 Effective 01/01/2022 | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Fee Reduction Per AB177 | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Decision and Notice of Decision | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial by Declaration
Judge: Vierra, Manuel |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice and Instructions to Arresting Officer | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial by Declaration Bail Posted | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Trial by Written Declaration-Filed | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Sent | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Traffic Citation Courtesy Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.