Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Studley, Elizabeth Maryjane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with SCHACK, LARRY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2014 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.3870.1192 / 4191945) ( V ) | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V ) | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V ) | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | PRO-SE HEARING SET FOR 08/30/2016 AT 9:30 AM IN 4A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BAUER, SHERWOOD | |
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD: ASSIGNED | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR NAME CHANGE | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | OTHER CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00 | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 07/01/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014DR001543 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.