Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ellis, Shameka M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, Caleb U, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with SCHWAB, CHARLES A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHWAB, CHARLES A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 13, 2014 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney DOUGLAS EDWARD REYMORE JR. - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER ON MOTION FOR DNA DEFAULT JUDGMENT/PETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY AND SUPPORT - CASE IS DISMISSED - Recorded (OR.3821.2938 / 4145159) | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER ON MOTION FOR DNA DEFAULT JUDGMENT/PETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY AND SUPPORT - CASE IS DISMISSED | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | DOR HEARING SET FOR 12/28/2015 AT 1:00 PM IN 2A/ , MAGISTRATE: DAVID, LEE | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST RESPONDENT | |
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.