Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fpl, St Lucie County Fire District, Tentschert, Deborah, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with GEIGER, DWIGHT L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2014 |
CategoryProbate/Guardianship |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney FREDERICK G SUNDHEIM - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM OSWPA@BELLSOUTH.NET; SHARONKNEWMAN@BELLSOUTH.NET; OSWPA@BELLSOUTH | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM COPY EMAILED TO OSWPA@BELLSOUTH.NET; SHARONKNEWMAN@BELLSOUTH.NET; OSWPA@BELLSOUTH.NET; MSOLOMON@SLCFD | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | WILL ON PROBATE - Recorded (OR.3694.2311 / 4018246) | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | WILL ON PROBATE | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.3693.2624 / 4017347) | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMI WILL TO PROBATE - Recorded (OR.3693.2617 / 4017343) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.