Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cenlar Central Loan Administration And Reporting, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with GEIGER, DWIGHT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2014 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney RENÉE MARQUIS-ABRAMS - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3944.698 / 4259255) ( V ) | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE ( V ) | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CLOSING ESTATE PROBATE CHECKLIST ( V ) | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DISCHARGE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3922.2608 / 4239164) ( V ) | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | SECOND AMENDED INVENTORY ( V ) | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY ( V ) | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS ( V ) | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.