Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Horvath, Vincent Joseph filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with GEIGER, DWIGHT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 06, 2014 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney FREDERICK G SUNDHEIM JR. - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3907.2269 / 4225827) ( V ) | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | CLOSING ESTATE PROBATE CHECKLIST ( V ) | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE ( V ) | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DISCHARGE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3906.916 / 4224494) ( V ) | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS ( V ) | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DISCHARGE ( V ) | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 10/10/2016 AT 9:00 AM IN 3D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: CROOM, JANET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.