Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Croteau, Amanda, against City Of Port St Lucie, Duncan, Livia L, Unknown Sp Livia L Duncan, Unk Tenant 1, Unk Tenant 2, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with GEIGER, DWIGHT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2014 |
CategoryHomestead Mf $250,000-More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 15, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: November 05, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney AMANDA CROTEAU - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2014CA002392, WELLS FARGO BANK N A VS. DUNCAN, LIVIA L - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CED-9/22/2015,CED-9/22/2015" | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - Recorded (OR.3790.1052 / 4113829) | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
September 22, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | COURT REGISTRY CLERK FEE CA ASSESSED $0.00 | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURES ASSESSED $60.00 | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE SHEET | |
September 08, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.