Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lasala, Christopher R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Post, Scott, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with MAKEMSON, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney JONATHAN JAY KIRSCHNER - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL INJUNCTION-IN EFFECT UNTIL JANUARY 15, 2015 - Recorded (OR.3595.2709 / 3915731) | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: KIRSCHNER, JONATHAN JAY ASSIGNED | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING SET FOR 01/15/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT-ORDER CONTINUING HEARING | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.