Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rumer, Paul, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hagler, Lauren N, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with BRONIS, BARBARA W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRONIS, BARBARA W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2013 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3566.1498 / 3883807) | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: VILLAFRANCO, LEONARD SILVIO ASSIGNED | |
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event | RE-NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event | UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR 10/03/2013 AT 8:45 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event | UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR 09/25/2013 AT 1:00 PM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.