Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fitzgerald, Bridgette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fitsimmons, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with MCCANN, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT ( V ) | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT ( V ) | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V ) | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS ( V ) | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EMANCIPATION ( V ) | |
March 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney HERNAN CASTRO - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4553.2755 / 4817076) ( V ) | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.