Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ortiz, Alicia, Montanez, Christina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Montanez, Alex, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with MCCANN, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCCANN, JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2013 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELIQUENCY ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4388.709 / 4679669) ( V ) | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELIQUENCY ( V ) | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V ) | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL ( V ) | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney HERNAN CASTRO - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY ( V ) | |
November 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney HERNAN CASTRO - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V ) | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.