Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Agency For Health Care Administration, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with CROOM, JANET C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCROOM, JANET C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2013 |
CategoryFormal Administration |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney KEVIN HUGH HENDRICKSON - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.3751.638 / 4075204) | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF CLAIMS | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.3731.159 / 4054845) | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITION TO DISCHARGE | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | RECPT OF BENEF CONSENT/DISCH | |
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event | PERSONAL REPRESENTAIVE'S PROOF CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.