Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Family Dollar filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lewis, Darek Lee, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with MAKEMSON, ROBERT R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2013 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ( V )
Date: April 05, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 23, 2021CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4294.1985 / 4592266) ( V )
Date: July 12, 2019RETURN MAIL ( V )
Date: March 21, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 30, 2018SENTENCING GUIDELINES
Date: March 21, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 14, 2018REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED CONVICTIONS WITH FINGERPRINTS
Date: June 28, 2016CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED
Date: October 16, 2013DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY / ALIBI
Date: October 30, 2013CAPIAS - COPY SIGNED BY JUDGE FILED
Date: October 15, 2013CAPIAS ISSUED
Date: October 10, 2013INFORMATION FILED FOR TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT
Date: October 10, 2013ORDER OF RESTITUTION
Date: March 21, 2014REQUEST ( V )
Date: June 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE PLACED WITH PENN CREDIT IN FILE penncredit_06092022.txt - BALANCE DUE $1629.56. | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 10/01/2021 - FAILED TO PAY $1629.56 | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY COSTS OR SETUP PAYMENT PLAN REQUIRED BY: 10/01/2021 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | COLLECTION COURT HEARING SET FOR 09/27/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN M/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4294.1985 / 4592266) ( V ) | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT ( V ) | |
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL ( V ) | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.