Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lamb, Kimberly A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lamb, Jeff, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with SCHACK, LARRY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2012 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney JAMI L DUCKSON - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3628.2769 / 3952069) | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES: ASSIGNED | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 03/21/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN 1A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 03/21/2014 AT 11:45 AM IN 1B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHACK, LARRY | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.