Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Felty, Kyle, Lerkins, Dustin, against Haag, Albert, Haag, Marlene, Promenade At Tradition Community Assn Inc, Promenade At Tradition Community Association, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with SCHACK, LARRY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2010 |
CategoryNonhomestd Mf $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA against Albert Haag and Marlene Haag in the Circuit Court of the 19th Judicial Circuit in St. Lucie County, Florida. The complaint alleges that the Haags executed a promissory note ...
AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 26, 2012MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 06, 2013MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND:COMPLAINT
Date: May 15, 2012ORDER ON MTN FOR LEAVE
Date: July 26, 2012MOTION TO QUASH
Date: May 12, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney DUSTIN LERKINS - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - Recorded (OR.3535.1673 / 3852029) | |
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2013000063678 | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED | |
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE SHEET | |
June 14, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL SALE FORECLOSURES ASSESSED $70.00 | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2013000056152 | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.