Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee, Deutsche Bank N T Company As Indenture Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Humphrey, Kimberly A, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with Oldehoff, Julie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2008 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AMENDED COMPLAINT:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY JANICE RABUYA ESQ
Date: July 14, 2008MOTION TO DISMISS:DEFT PERLMUTTER MTN TO DISMISS EDWARD W BECHT ESQ
Date: May 13, 2008MOTION TO DISMISS:DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2008MTN FOR FINAL JUDGMENT:MTN FFJ
Date: November 12, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE:DEFT, JEROME B PERLMUTTER'S REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: November 25, 2008MTN FOR EXTENSION:PLTF'S MTN FOR EXT OF TIME TO RESP TO DEFT'S REQ FOR PRODUCTION AND INTERROGS
Date: December 31, 2008ANSWER:DEFT JEROME B PERLMUTTER ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT ATTY EDWARD W BECHT
Date: February 06, 2009RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE:PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFTS REQ FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 16, 2009RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: October 26, 2009MOTION:CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR ON PLTFS NAME
Date: February 05, 2010MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION:SUB OF PARTY PLTF
Date: August 04, 2010AFFIDAVIT TO SUPPORT MOTION:FOR SUM FJDG
Date: September 10, 2010ORDER SET CASE MGMT CONF
Date: June 27, 2012ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONF
Date: July 25, 2012MOTION
Date: September 27, 2012ORDER MISCELLANEOUS
Date: October 08, 2012NTC VOLT DISMISSAL:OF COUNT II
Date: February 05, 2013ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL
Date: May 21, 2013ORDER ADOPTING RECOM OF MAGISTRATE
Date: July 30, 2013ASSIGNMENT OF BID - Recorded (OR.3579.680 / 3898163)
Date: November 14, 2013MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: December 06, 2013ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL
Date: January 22, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney EDWARD W BECHT - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney LUCIANA C UGARTE - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE TYPE CHANGED PER CURRENT OSCA RULE | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL | |
January 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - Recorded (OR.3594.1926 / 3914300) | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $301.70 RECEIPT #2014000002333 | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | DOC STAMPS ASSESSED $301.70 - ASOB REC'D AFTER SALE DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.