Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lebron Velazquez, Lourdes, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Qasem, Mahmoud Salah, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, FL, . Putnam County, FL Superior Courts with PREDDY, ROSE MARIE KARADSHEH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPutnam County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | POSTING - AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING (CC SAT OFC) | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT MINUTES | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL - LOURDES VELAZQUEZ | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | POSTING - AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING (INTERLACHEN) | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET HEARING | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (TO BE SIGNED) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | POSTING - AFFIDAVIT OF POSTING (PALATKA COURTHOUSE) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - TO MAHMOUD SALAH QASEM (CORRECTING CASE NUMBER) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.