Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Pratten, Christian, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pratten, Morganne, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, FL, . Putnam County, FL Superior Courts with PREDDY, ROSE MARIE KARADSHEH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePREDDY, ROSE MARIE KARADSHEH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPutnam County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER OF SUBSITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND/OR MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - MAGISTRATE | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - 1. FORMER HUSBANDS MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND/OR MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND OR MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET - REOPENING CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.