Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Smt Properties Group Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Maguire, Matthew Christopher, against Harbin, Paul, Montgomery, Betty Jean, Parties, Unknown, represented by Pinaud, Donald E, in the jurisdiction of Putnam County, FL, . Putnam County, FL Superior Courts with JANESK, KENNETH JAMES II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPutnam County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 14, 2022COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: September 14, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 14, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO: KAREN MONTGOMERY
Date: October 06, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HOWARD MONTGOMERY
Date: October 06, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DONNA DEGENNARO
Date: October 06, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: October 25, 2022NOTICE- ANSWER DEFENDANT KAREN P. MONTGOMERY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 14, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO: HOWARD MONTGOMERY, JR
Date: January 06, 2023STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: December 20, 2022NOTICE- ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT DONNA DEGENNARO, HEIR TO BETTY JEAN MONTGOMERY
Date: November 03, 2022NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE TO KAREN MONTGOMERY - SERVED 10-19-2022
Date: February 15, 2023DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST HOWARD MONTGOMER JR
Date: March 03, 2023MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE
Date: June 13, 2023FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE - AS TO HOWARD MONTGOMERY JR
Date: June 15, 2023NOTICE OF ISSUE
Date: June 19, 2023ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 07, 2023CIRCUIT CIVIL MINUTES: CASE SET FOR TRIAL DURING DECEMBER 2023 TRIAL TERM.
Date: September 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: September 01, 2023ORDER OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT - SET FOR CONTESTED TRIAL IN DECEMBER 2023
Date: September 28, 2023COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BETTY JEAN MONTGOMERY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 02, 2023PRETRIAL STATEMENT PLAINTIFF'S PRE TRIAL STATEMENT
Date: December 08, 2023ORDER TRIAL ORDER FOR DECEMBER 2023 TRIAL TERM - NON JURY TRIAL 12-18-2023 9:00
Date: December 04, 2023PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST
Date: December 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - UPDATED SCHEDULING ORDER FOR DECEMBER 2023 TRIAL TERM - DECEMBER TRIAL CANCELLED - DOCKET SOUNDING RESET 01-02-2024 2:00 | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL STATEMENT PLAINTIFF'S PRE TRIAL STATEMENT | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TRIAL ORDER FOR DECEMBER 2023 TRIAL TERM - NON JURY TRIAL 12-18-2023 9:00 | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL MINUTES: PL PRESENT/DEF (P.H) NOT PRESENT/DECEASED DEF ATTY PRESENT; PARTIES READY FOR TRIAL; 1/2 DAY NON-JURY TRIAL NEEDED. BOTH PARTIED REQUEST 2ND WEEK OF TRIAL TERM FOR SCHEDULING PURPOSES. COURT TO ISSUE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ALLOW COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BETTY JEAN MONTGOMERY TO APPEAR BY ZOOM TELECONFERENCING | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING NON JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL - DOCKET CALL 11-28-2023 2:00 - TRIAL DATE AND TIME TO BE SET AT DOCKET CALL | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT BETTY JEAN MONTGOMERY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL MINUTES: CASE SET FOR TRIAL DURING DECEMBER 2023 TRIAL TERM. | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT - SET FOR CONTESTED TRIAL IN DECEMBER 2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.