Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Peterson, Jessie, Peterson, Larry, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jenkins Kelly-Ann, against Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Adipietro Theresa J, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 BRANDON J RAFOOL presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 BRANDON J RAFOOL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
This complaint is filed by Larry and Jessie Peterson against Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they entered into an insurance contract with the defendant, which provided property insurance for their property l...
COMPLAINT
Date: September 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATORS REPORT - CONFLICT HAS BEEN RESOLVED | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING MEDIATION | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED FOR A SUBPOENA - HEHISLER PAYES | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS FIELD ADJUSTER | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF VIRTUAL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS FIELD ADJUSTER HEHISLER PAYES | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF HEHISLER PAYES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.