Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Drb Capital Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Thomas Ernest L Jr, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 BRANDON J RAFOOL presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 BRANDON J RAFOOL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT (AMENDED TO LIST PAYEE COMPLETE NAME) | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 04/16/2020 11:45 AM | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | APPLICATION | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.