Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lambert Shannon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Roberts Charles Jr, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.