Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Waldo Valerie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Bouzas Carol, Spizzica Christine M., in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2020 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 09/23/2021 09:00 AM | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
September 20, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 20, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE DEFENDANTS | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CROSS NOTICEE OF DEPOSITION | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF AND REQUEST FOR EXAMINATIONS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.360 | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.