Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb As Owner Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Clark Kaitlin Clark, against Jackson, Elizabeth, Meyer, Richard, Microf Llc, Onemain Financial Of America, Inc.F K A American General Financial Services Of America Inc, A Dissolved Indianapolis Coi, Polk County, Florida, (total of 10) See All represented by Klohn James A, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 MICHAEL P MCDANIEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2020 |
CategoryRpmfn - Foreclosure Non Homestead Resident |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
This complaint is a verified mortgage foreclosure complaint filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB as Owner Trustee for the Plaza Revolving Trust against various defendants. The defendants include the unknown heirs, devisees, grantees, assigne...
VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR MAY 24 2023 AT 11:45AM AS TO DEFENDANTS RICHARD R MEYERS REQUEST TO VOID | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 05/24/2023 11:45 AM | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR APRIL 17 2023 AT 11 45 A M AS TO DEFENDANTS RICHARD R MEYERS REQUEST TO | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 04/17/2023 11:45 AM | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 04/27/2023 01:30 PM | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO VOID AND REISSUE CHECK | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.