Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Trifactor Solutions Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Buckley Michael, against Phelan John Thomas Jr, represented by Tamayo John Marc, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 10/29/2021 01:00 PM | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - GENERAL TRACK | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 10/29/2021 01:00 PM | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ASSESS DAMAGES ON BOND | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS TRIFACTOR SOLUTIONS LLCS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ASSESS DAMAGES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.