Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sanders Reena Patel, against Adamstown 1 Condominium Inc, Adamstown 1 Of Winter Haven, All Unknown Parties Claiming Interest By Through Under Or Against A Named Defendant To This Action Or Having Or Claiming, Unknown Spouse Of Amanda L Vanderheydn, Unknown Tenant 1, (total of 7) See All represented by Tankel Scott B, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfn - Foreclosure Non Homestead Resident |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.