Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Db Rr Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant 2, Unknown Tenant 1, Guerra, Andres, Black Square Real Estate Inc, Aaa Real Estate Investment Services Llc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 JOHN RADABAUGH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 JOHN RADABAUGH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfn - Foreclosure Non Homestead Resident |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT AAA REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES LLC ANSWER TO | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT AAA REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES LLC ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | AAA REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES LLC ANSWER | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT, AAA REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT SERVICES, LLC ANSWER TO | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF REPLY TO DEFENDANT ANDRES GUERRA ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | CLERKS MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ISSUED/ BLACK SQUARE REAL ESTATE INC | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & UNSIGNED DEFAULT | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK RE: MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.