Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford, Patricia, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Constantinos Jeffrey, against Columbian Life Insurance Company, represented by Brusa Elizabeth R, Lister Cheryl J, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 DANA Y MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCR AND JURY TRIAL | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL AND DIRECTING MEDIATION VIRTUAL | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 01/12/2023 09:00 AM | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR REMOVAL FROM SERVICE LIST | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 10/19/2021 10:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.