Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Salet, Keri L, against Hardy, Eileen Marie, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER (CIVIL) ORDER ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT. JURISDICTION RETAINED UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. KERI L SALET (Attorney) on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA NA (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 269378 Date: 08/24/2021 |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, OTHER, PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION TO RE-OPEN AND ENTER JUDGMENT. DISMISSAL ENTERED AS REQUESTED. KERI L SALET (Attorney) on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 225 - CONDITIONAL. A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED NO LATER THAN AUGUST 9, 2024. KERI L SALET (Attorney) on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA NA (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST PAPER PLEADING (DEFENDANT)-UNDER $10K IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of EILEEN MARIE HARDY (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 269377 Date: 08/24/2021 | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION BETWEEN THE PARTIES (NO ORDER) STIPULATION AGREEMENT. KERI L SALET (Attorney) on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA NA (PLAINTIFF) |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS ===BY FAX===PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/15/2021. PARTY SERVED EILEEN MARIE HARDY COPIES OF SUMMONS; COMPLAINT-CONTRACT; STATEMENT OF LOCATION/VENUE; civil case cover sheet; notice of inclusion in delay reduction program and notice of case management conference; alternative dispute resolution (adr) packet |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 10/27/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DEMAND UNDER $10K Receipt: 263686 Date: 04/08/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.