Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mortgage Research Center Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Hammerstone Holding Llc A Florida Limited Liabilit, Fort Socrum Village Homeowners Association Inc, Possession 2, Unknown Party In, Possession 1, Unknown Party In, Perkins, Shalonda, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 JOHN RADABAUGH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 JOHN RADABAUGH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISSOLVING LIS PENDENS | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - FORT SOCRUM VILLAGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC | |
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED - SHALONDA PERKINS | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44540ed-a414-4ab8-8332-af0e092c6a95/results/84888b97-f467-4827-b85c-4f23f45db99c/lines/a062be65-71bd-4145-872d-05d352985017/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED- HAMMERSTONE HOLDINGS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY BY SERVING |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44540ed-a414-4ab8-8332-af0e092c6a95/results/84888b97-f467-4827-b85c-4f23f45db99c/lines/67a1c1b9-ee4e-4393-8a7a-1531497c6682/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED / UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44540ed-a414-4ab8-8332-af0e092c6a95/results/84888b97-f467-4827-b85c-4f23f45db99c/lines/67a1c1b9-ee4e-4393-8a7a-1531497c6682/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS UNSERVED / UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44540ed-a414-4ab8-8332-af0e092c6a95/results/84888b97-f467-4827-b85c-4f23f45db99c/lines/67a1c1b9-ee4e-4393-8a7a-1531497c6682/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / EDWARD L PERKINS |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44540ed-a414-4ab8-8332-af0e092c6a95/results/84888b97-f467-4827-b85c-4f23f45db99c/lines/53d0b0c2-9dff-4777-82d5-85f5744cd6b4/Doc ANSWER / RESPONSE -ED PERKINS |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44540ed-a414-4ab8-8332-af0e092c6a95/results/84888b97-f467-4827-b85c-4f23f45db99c/lines/1b984072-30e1-4a88-9b48-1a6a684d9c48/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44540ed-a414-4ab8-8332-af0e092c6a95/results/84888b97-f467-4827-b85c-4f23f45db99c/lines/1b984072-30e1-4a88-9b48-1a6a684d9c48/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ HAMMERSTONE HOLDING LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.