Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carter, Tyna D, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lockwood Douglas A Iii, against The State Of Florida, Anthony, Shondra L, represented by Dunn Mark S, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | STATE OF FLORIDAS MOTION TO BE EXCUSED FROM ALL PRETRIAL MATTERS AND APPEARING AT SCHEDULED | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 09/22/2021 03:00 PM | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;44764;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/419c673c-2558-4f95-b0be-709e05206023/results/d31fced3-3f9a-4df4-bd4e-337c993efd4b/lines/e448d55b-9099-4834-80c4-c4186b550c68/Doc NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;77618;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/419c673c-2558-4f95-b0be-709e05206023/results/d31fced3-3f9a-4df4-bd4e-337c993efd4b/lines/7f448650-c113-4538-844c-6ddb5a016845/Doc STATE OF FLORIDAS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;64485;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/419c673c-2558-4f95-b0be-709e05206023/results/d31fced3-3f9a-4df4-bd4e-337c993efd4b/lines/5377b4e8-adf7-4c9b-8473-7732cdff421a/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- STATE ATTORNEYS OFFICE STATE OF FLORIDA |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;121853;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/419c673c-2558-4f95-b0be-709e05206023/results/d31fced3-3f9a-4df4-bd4e-337c993efd4b/lines/0f2eeb48-1b6e-4e17-ab76-279beb1b013b/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK- SHANDRA L ANTHONY |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;59973;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/419c673c-2558-4f95-b0be-709e05206023/results/d31fced3-3f9a-4df4-bd4e-337c993efd4b/lines/b8da0691-c401-4fb0-bb67-6234dbe17aed/Doc VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.