Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bryant Carolyn, Broadnax Nina, Johnson Kenyo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Jean Rodlaire, Mathurin Marie, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 09/24/2019 09:00 AM | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE RECEIVED BY JUDGE | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PERSON | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF NINA BROADNAX | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF EXAMINATION WITH DR JOHN H SHIM PURSUANT TO | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT TO EXAMINATION AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE AT EXAMINATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.