Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Caliber Home Loans Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Aldea Reserve Home Owners Association A Florida Not For Profit Corporation, Lopes, Gregory David, Lopes, Sandra, Unknown Spouse Of Gregory David Lopes, Unknown Tenant In Possession 1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 06, 2019SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - SANDRA LOPES
Date: February 18, 2019ANSWER / RESPONSE - SANDRA MCFARLAND FORMERLY SANDRA LOPES
Date: February 19, 2019SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-GREGORY DAVID LOPES
Date: January 31, 2019VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE
Date: December 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER / RESPONSE - SANDRA MCFARLAND FORMERLY SANDRA LOPES | |
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - SANDRA LOPES | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY SANDRA LOPES UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GREGORY DAVID LOPES AKA | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER - ALDEA RESERVE HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.