Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hall Christine Lankey, against Dahlquist, David W, Dahlquist, Evelyn, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Unknown Tenants Owners 1, Unknown Tenants Owners 2, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: September 26, 2019FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: July 09, 2019CLERK OF COURTS FILING LOCATION OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT
Date: April 23, 2019PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 08, 2019AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: April 08, 2019DEFAULT- SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (CLERK)
Date: March 28, 2019DEFAULT (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)
Date: March 21, 2019CLERKS DEFAULT/ DAVID W DAHLQUIST AKA DAVID DAHLQUIST
Date: February 14, 2019CLERKS DEFAULT/ UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1 NKA LAURA SORBET
Date: February 14, 2019DEFAULT (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK)
Date: February 12, 2019ANSWER / RESPONSE AND REQUEST FOR MEDIATION - EVELYN M DAHLQUIST
Date: February 05, 2019SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1
Date: January 18, 2019EVELYN DAHLQUISTANSWER / RESPONSE
Date: February 07, 2019SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-DAVID W DAHLQUIST AKA DAVID DAHLQUIST BY SERVING EVELYN DAHLQUIST
Date: January 18, 2019SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Date: January 11, 2019SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - EVELYN DAHLQUIST
Date: January 18, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: December 27, 2018VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE REINSTATE LOAN DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS CASE | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF MAIL ADDRESS | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA R JUD ADMIN 2 516 | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REFUND OF CREDIT CARD OR E PORTAL | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLA R JUD ADMIN 2.516 | |
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED CHECK REQUEST - CIVIL LAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.