Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee For Indymac Indx Mortgage Loan Trust 2007 Ar5 Mortgage Pass Through Cert, filed a(n) case against Prescott, Joanne, Prescott, Shane, Sandy Ridge Homeowners Association Of Polk County Inc, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with Dana Y. Moore presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: March 13, 2020NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: March 03, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RESET FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: February 24, 2020ORDER RATIFYING FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2020ORDER ON MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 28, 2019
Date: October 25, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: August 27, 2019FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2019EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE AND RATIFY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2019MORTGAGE
Date: July 31, 2019ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: April 23, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 25, 2019PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: April 23, 2019PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER - WITH JUDGE'S RECEIVED STAMP
Date: April 22, 2019PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: April 16, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SANDY RIDGE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION OF POLK COUNTY
Date: December 20, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - JOANNE PRESCOTT
Date: December 20, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SHANE PRESCOTT
Date: December 20, 2018NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: December 20, 2018VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORCLOSURE OF MORTGAGE
Date: December 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT/PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RESET FORECLOSURE SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.