Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Appel, Amy, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Nathan Owens As Manager Of Walmart Store #968, Walmart Stores East Lp A Foreign Limited Partnership, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
CategoryNegpl - Negligence Premises Liability Comm |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - WALMART STORES EAST LP
Date: December 20, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - NATHAN OWENS MANAGER
Date: December 20, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT-ADJOURNED-8/22/19 | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES EAST LP'S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.