Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Haney, Stephanie, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Racetrac Petroleum, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 17, 2017 |
CategoryNegpl - Negligence Premises Liability Comm |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE
Date: September 19, 2019MEDIATOR'S REPORT - SETTLED
Date: August 08, 2019JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Date: September 12, 2019ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2019AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: June 12, 2019ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 12, 2019NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: June 11, 2019COPY OF ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 10, 2019ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 12, 2019CONFORMED COPY OF ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 07, 2018ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 04, 2018ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 25, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 15, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 15, 2018ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 15, 2018MEDIATOR'S REPORT - CONTINUED
Date: February 20, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: January 12, 2018DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 15, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT
Date: August 15, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK RACETRAC PETROLEUM INC
Date: July 17, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - RECEIVED BY JUDGE | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR'S REPORT - SETTLED | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 09/16/2019 09:15 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.