Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Florida State Of, filed a(n) case against Palmetto Surety Corporation, Homan Patty West, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJune 30, 2017 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON STIPULATED MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT | |
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATED MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT COVER LETTER | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | FORFEITURE | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURTS FILING LOCATION OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.