Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Home Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Doe, Jane, Doe, John, Robinson Ivelee Jr, Rudolph, Vera, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2017 |
CategoryRpmfn - Foreclosure Non Homestead Resident |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: May 18, 2018OWNERS CLAIM FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SURPLUS
Date: May 15, 2018CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: April 19, 2018FORECLOSURE SALE BID LOG
Date: April 18, 2018LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Date: April 12, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 18, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: January 18, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 07, 2017MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: November 09, 2017PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT
Date: September 14, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - POLK COUNTY CIRCUIT CIVIL
Date: June 23, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - JANE DOE
Date: June 23, 2017VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 23, 2017NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | COPY OF REQUESTED CHECK | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | UNDELIVERED ENVELOPE | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST TO DISBURSE SURPLUS FUNDS FROM REGISTRY | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S VERA RUDOLPH OWNER'S CLAIM FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SURPLUS | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 07/26/2018 09:00 AM | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | SURPLUS VERIFICATION | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | OWNERS CLAIM FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SURPLUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.