Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Troy R Lotane, Esq, against Bennett, Vanessa, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed by Bayfront HMA Medical Center LLC, doing business as Bayfront Health St. Petersburg, against Vanessa Bennett. The complaint alleges damages in the amount of $1,824.59, exclusive of interest, costs, and fees. The jurisdiction ...
COMPLAINT E-FILED Doc # 2
Date: August 12, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: August 12, 2021SUMMONS NOT ISSUED Doc # 3 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH) CASE DISMISSED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19 WITHOUT PREJUDICE Party: BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS Doc # 17 | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 18 | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY Doc # 16 TO OBTAIN SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT Party: BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY Doc # 15 TO OBTAIN SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT Party: BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER LLC | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER Doc # 14 ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME IN ORDER TO OBTAIN SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) NON-SERVICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
May 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 13 NO RESOLUTION BEFORE DEADLINE OR SUMMONS AT COURT Party: BENNETT, VANESSA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.