Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Kevin Spinozza, Esq, against Knipp, Joe, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE Doc # 10 REGARDING SERVICE OF ALIAS/PLURIES SUMMONS
Date: September 28, 2021SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 8 Party: KNIPP, JOE
Date: August 13, 2021SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 9 Party: KNIPP, JOE
Date: August 13, 2021REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS Doc # 11 Party: KNIPP, JOE
Date: September 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 4
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 3 A ACCOUNT STATEMENT
Date: July 30, 2021STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 2
Date: July 30, 2021SUMMONS NOT ISSUED Doc # 7 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: July 30, 2021DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 6
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 5
Date: July 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS Doc # 11 Party: KNIPP, JOE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 10 REGARDING SERVICE OF ALIAS/PLURIES SUMMONS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 8 Party: KNIPP, JOE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 9 Party: KNIPP, JOE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 4
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 3 A ACCOUNT STATEMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.