Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
7525 Seminole Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Any And All Unknown Occupants, Cooper, Tyrone, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAGGER, EDWIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryResidential Eviction Possession Only (Non-Monetary) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is an action to evict the tenants from a property located at 7525 Seminole Street North, Unit 110, Seminole, Florida 33777. The plaintiff, 7525 Seminole, LLC, alleges that the defendants, Tyrone Cooper and any and all unknown occupants...
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 10 Party: COOPER, TYRONE
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 14
Date: August 02, 2021CLERK DEFAULT Doc # 19 Party: ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Party: COOPER, TYRONE
Date: August 03, 2021MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT Doc # 15 CT I Party: 7525 SEMINOLE LLC
Date: August 02, 2021PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 17 CT I
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 16
Date: August 02, 2021WRIT - SERVED Doc # 23 OF POSSESSION EXECUTED
Date: September 09, 2021WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF Doc # 22
Date: August 26, 2021SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 12 07062021 Party: ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS
Date: July 26, 2021COMPLAINT Doc # 1 FOR EVICTION
Date: June 30, 2021SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 13 07062021 Party: COOPER, TYRONE
Date: July 26, 2021DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER Doc # 5
Date: June 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 11 Party: ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS
Date: July 01, 2021CORRESPONDENCE Doc # 7 REGARDINGN PROCESS SERVER
Date: June 30, 2021AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT Doc # 6
Date: June 30, 2021LEASE Doc # 2
Date: June 30, 2021THREE DAY NOTICE Doc # 3
Date: June 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 4
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT - SERVED Doc # 23 OF POSSESSION EXECUTED | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO SHERIFF Doc # 22 | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Doc # 21 Party: ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Party: COOPER, TYRONE Vol./Book 21660, Page 403, 1 pages | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTY - CASE DISPOSED BY DEFAULT | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK DEFAULT Doc # 19 Party: ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Party: COOPER, TYRONE | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE Doc # 20 FJ W/ COPIES&ENVS | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 14 | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT Doc # 15 CT I Party: 7525 SEMINOLE LLC | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 17 CT I | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.