Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Backus, Latoya, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joseph C Whitelock, Esq, against Benjacob, Nachum, represented by Lisa M Orga, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAMSBERGER, THOMAS M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 2 Party: BENJACOB, NACHUM
Date: September 02, 2021COMPLAINT Doc # 3
Date: September 02, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Doc # 10
Date: October 19, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 14
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 13 OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Doc # 12
Date: November 26, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 11
Date: November 23, 2021ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 6 Party: BENJACOB, NACHUM
Date: October 11, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 7 (MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE)
Date: October 11, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 9
Date: October 11, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 8
Date: October 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 5 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES Party: BENJACOB, NACHUM
Date: October 11, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Doc # 14
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
CIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 13 OF DEPOSITION
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
November 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Doc # 12
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 11
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Doc # 10
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 6 Party: BENJACOB, NACHUM
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 7 (MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE)
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 9
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 8
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.