Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Velocity Investments Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jonathan P Hempfling, Esq, against Ahrens, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed by Velocity Investments, LLC against Daniel Ahrens in the County Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida. The complaint consists of two counts: breach of agreement and money lent.
In the first count, ...
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: April 30, 2021SUMMONS - NOT ISSUED Doc # 2 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: April 30, 2021CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP Doc # 26
Date: February 13, 2023CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE TRANSFER FEES DUE Doc # 21
Date: January 30, 2023RECEIPT Doc # 28 FOR TRANSFER
Date: February 16, 2023CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP Doc # 23
Date: February 07, 2023CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED Doc # 27 1_9214890194038303533184_202302_21-003837-SC.pdf
Date: February 14, 2023ORDER GRANTING Doc # 20 MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE
Date: January 30, 2023COMPLAINT E-FILED Doc # 4 WITH PROMISSORY NOTE
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 3
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 6 Party: AHRENS, DANIEL
Date: July 19, 2021REQUEST FOR ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR Doc # 7 Party: AHRENS, DANIEL
Date: October 18, 2021SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 9 Party: AHRENS, DANIEL
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT Doc # 28 FOR TRANSFER | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED Doc # 27 1_9214890194038303533184_202302_21-003837-SC | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP Doc # 26 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT-TRACKING SLIP Doc # 23 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS - CASE TRANSFERRED CITRUS COUNTY | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DO NOT DOCKET - CASE CONSOLIDATED OR TRANSFERRED Doc # 25 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | (((((FILE VERIFIED TO THIS DATE))))) Doc # 24 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT Doc # 22 FOR ORIGINAL CASE FILE (COPY) | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK RE TRANSFER FEES DUE Doc # 21 | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING Doc # 20 MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.