Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hine, Melissa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by William H Winters, William H Winters, Esq, against Hazlewood, Aminta, Posselt, Jon, represented by Stephanie C Ferlita, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Melissa Hine against defendants Jon Posselt and Aminta Hazlewood. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $30,000. The damages claimed include medical expenses, nursing care and treatment, loss of earnings, loss of ability...
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 12 08122021 Party: HAZLEWOOD, AMINTA
Date: August 18, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 73 (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: April 25, 2022NOTICE OF INTENT Doc # 66 TO SUBPOENA
Date: April 07, 2022ORDER OF REFERRAL Doc # 65 TO MEDIATION
Date: April 06, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 63 (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: March 29, 2022NOTICE OF INTENT Doc # 71 TO SUBPOENA
Date: April 21, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 67
Date: April 07, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 72 -DEFENDANT
Date: April 21, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 68
Date: April 12, 2022ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Doc # 64
Date: April 05, 2022NOTICE OF CONFLICT Doc # 74
Date: April 25, 2022COMPLIANCE WITH Doc # 70 REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 15, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 69
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 3
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 5
Date: July 30, 2021ORDER TO APPEAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE Doc # 61 04012022 10:45 TELEPHONIC
Date: January 27, 2022SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 10 Party: HAZLEWOOD, AMINTA
Date: July 30, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 4
Date: July 30, 2021DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 8
Date: July 30, 2021PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL Doc # 47 DISCOVERY W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS
Date: December 03, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 9 Party: POSSELT, JON
Date: July 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 7
Date: July 30, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 6
Date: July 30, 2021COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 33 10/11/21
Date: October 11, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: July 30, 2021SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 11 08122021 Party: HAZLEWOOD, AMINTA
Date: August 18, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 17 W/ATTACHMENTS
Date: August 30, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 16
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 15
Date: August 30, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Doc # 34
Date: October 13, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 23 VIDEO
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 19
Date: September 10, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 22
Date: September 14, 2021ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 13 Party: HAZLEWOOD, AMINTA Party: POSSELT, JON
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT Doc # 21 TO SUBPOENA
Date: September 13, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 20
Date: September 10, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 18
Date: September 10, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 37
Date: October 26, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 24 ZOOM
Date: September 23, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 35
Date: October 13, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 25
Date: September 28, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 26
Date: September 28, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Doc # 28
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 27 Party: POSSELT, JON
Date: October 05, 2021OBJECTION Doc # 30 AND MOTN FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO SUBPOENA
Date: October 06, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 31 1 - HIPAA CERTIFICATION 45 C F R
Date: October 06, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 29 FOR NON-PARTY WITNESS AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: October 06, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Doc # 32 TO DATE ONLY
Date: October 08, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 43
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT Doc # 36 TO SUBPOENA
Date: October 22, 2021NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 45
Date: November 24, 2021PRIVILEGE LOG Doc # 38
Date: October 26, 2021SUBPOENA - SERVED Doc # 39
Date: November 03, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA Doc # 40
Date: November 15, 2021NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 42
Date: November 17, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 51
Date: January 03, 2022NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 41
Date: November 17, 2021COMPLIANCE WITH Doc # 52 REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 04, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Doc # 44 W/REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: November 18, 2021SUBPOENA FOR DEPO Doc # 54 (SIGNED)
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL Doc # 46 OF PLTF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: November 24, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 56
Date: January 12, 2022COMPLIANCE WITH Doc # 48 REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 06, 2021CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 49 PROPOSED ORDER - W/NOTE - DOES NOT COMPLY
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA Doc # 50
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 53 VIA ZOOM
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL Doc # 55
Date: January 12, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 57 (CROSS-)
Date: January 25, 2022CERTIFICATE Doc # 60 OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: January 26, 2022COMPLIANCE WITH Doc # 62 REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 59 05092022 1:30
Date: January 26, 2022PROPOSED ORDER UNSIGNED Doc # 58
Date: January 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 75 PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 73 (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFLICT Doc # 74
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT Doc # 71 TO SUBPOENA
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 72 -DEFENDANT
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLIANCE WITH Doc # 70 REQUEST FOR COPIES
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 69
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 68
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT Doc # 66 TO SUBPOENA
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 67
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.