Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mdr Queensmark Llc, Qm Apartments Lp, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Ryan R Mccain, Esq, against Hart, Robert, represented by Philip A Weylie, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2021 |
CategoryResidential Eviction Possession Only (Non-Monetary) |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a legal document filed by QM Apartments, LP and MDR Queensmark, LLC dba Osprey Pointe Apartment Homes against Robert Hart in the County Court in Pinellas County, Florida. The complaint is for the eviction of a residential tenant. Th...
COMPLAINT Doc # 2 WITH ATTACHMENTS
Date: April 30, 2021DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMT OF DEPOSIT IN COURT REG Doc # 9
Date: May 12, 2021DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 10
Date: May 12, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 3 Party: HART, ROBERT
Date: April 30, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 11 A - SPECIAL WARRANTY DEED
Date: May 12, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 14 B - EVICTION PROTECTION DECLARATION
Date: May 12, 2021SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 5 05062021 Party: HART, ROBERT
Date: May 10, 2021ANSWER Doc # 7 Party: HART, ROBERT
Date: May 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 4 Party: HART, ROBERT
Date: May 04, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: April 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 16 WITH WRIT TO ISSUE AFTER JUNE 30, 2021, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SCHEDULE THIS MATTER FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING TO DETERMINE SUFFICIENCY OF DEFENDANT'S CDC DECLARATION
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DETERMINE AMT OF DEPOSIT IN COURT REG Doc # 9
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 10
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 8 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS Party: HART, ROBERT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 11 A - SPECIAL WARRANTY DEED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 13 A - FEDERAL REGISTER/DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES RE:COVID-19
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 14 B - EVICTION PROTECTION DECLARATION
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION Doc # 12 FOR STAY OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING PURSUANT TO TEMPORARY HALT Filed by: HART, ROBERT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 15 C - HHS/CDC TEMPORARY HALT IN RESIDENTIAL EVICTIONS TO PREVENT THE FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19 FREQUENTLY ASKED QUESTIONS
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Doc # 7 Party: HART, ROBERT
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.