Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Leyton, Luis, Jr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Frank Dicosola, Esq, against Blake Investment Partners Llc, Wilder, Robert Edgar, Iii, represented by Byron T Jackson, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 9
Date: July 01, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 15 AND OBJECTIONS
Date: July 29, 2021SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 11 07092021 Party: BLAKE INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC
Date: July 12, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 21
Date: October 12, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 22 WITH PREJUDICE
Date: October 12, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 18
Date: August 09, 2021CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION Doc # 20
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 16 08062021 W/ATTACHED SIGNED SUBPOENAS
Date: August 06, 2021ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 14 Party: BLAKE INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC
Date: July 29, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 17
Date: August 09, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 19
Date: August 11, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 10
Date: July 01, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 8
Date: July 01, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 7
Date: July 01, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 6
Date: July 01, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 5
Date: July 01, 2021COMPLAINT Doc # 4
Date: July 01, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 3 Party: BLAKE INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC
Date: July 01, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: July 01, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 2 Party: WILDER, ROBERT EDGAR, III
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 21
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 22 WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION Doc # 20
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 19
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 18
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 17
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 16 08062021 W/ATTACHED SIGNED SUBPOENAS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 15 AND OBJECTIONS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 14 Party: BLAKE INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.