Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Shaluly, Marie, Shaluly, Michael, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by James S Constable, Esq, against Certain Underwriters At Lloyds, Certain Underwriters At Lloyds London Servicing Policy Number B1136P0009518, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEYER, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Michael Shaluly and Marie Shaluly against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London. The plaintiffs allege that they owned a property in Pinellas County, Florida, and had an insurance policy with the defendant...
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: June 30, 2021MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Doc # 14
Date: January 24, 2022REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 7
Date: September 10, 2021DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 5 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 12
Date: January 21, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 11 12132021 W/ ATTACHMENTS
Date: December 13, 2021CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 13 PROPOSED ORDER
Date: January 24, 2022COMPLAINT E-FILED Doc # 2
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 6
Date: September 10, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 4 Party: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS
Date: June 30, 2021DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 3
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 8
Date: September 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Doc # 14
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 13 PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS ORDER Doc # 12
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 11 12132021 W/ ATTACHMENTS
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 10 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT Party: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S DISCOVERY REQUESTS
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 8
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 7
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 6
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 5 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.